MD HB22 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain departments that issue occupational licenses or certificates from denying an application for a license or certificate based solely on an applicant's criminal history if a period of 7 years or more has passed since the applicant's conviction for any crime and the applicant has not been charged with another crime other than a minor traffic violation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-39) (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (99-39)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {553890/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-16HouseHearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-11-19HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback