MD HB219 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making the crime of human trafficking in a case in which the victim of the crime is an adult a felony, rather than a misdemeanor; and making a conforming change.
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2016-02-04 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Human Rights
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
Victims
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Human Rights
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
Victims