MD HB212 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB5
Note: Carry Over of previous HB34
Note: Carry Over of previous HB34
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (31-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (31-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from committing the common law crime of indecent exposure; providing a penalty of imprisonment of up to three years or a fine of up to $1,000 or both; prohibiting a person from, with prurient intent, committing the common law crime of indecent exposure within the sight of a minor who is at least 2 years old and is more than 4 years younger than the person; and providing a penalty of up to five years imprisonment and a fine of up to $10,000 or both for a violation of this section of the Act.
Title
Criminal Law - Indecent Exposure Within the Sight of a Minor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {993624/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-02-22 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB212 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (31-0)
HB34 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed
SB208 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
HB34 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed
SB208 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Penalties and Sentences
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Penalties and Sentences
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 11 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |