MD HB206 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1094

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring early voting centers to be open during the hours between 7 a.m. and 8 p.m. during each early voting day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Hours of Operation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 660
2021-04-12HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (111-24)
2021-04-12HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {414133/1 Adopted
2021-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-12HouseThird Reading Passed (119-11)
2021-02-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-09HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-10-15HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1094 (Carry Over) 2020-03-10 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB596 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law10301.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback