MD SB596 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring early voting centers to be open during the hours between 7 a.m. and 8 p.m. each early voting day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
2021-04-07SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (118-18)
2021-04-05HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2021-03-22HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-22HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-08HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-05HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-03-04SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {244437/1 Adopted
2021-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB206 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 660

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law10301.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback