MD HB20 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the method of calculating a certain reduction in the State agricultural land transfer tax for an instrument of writing that transfers title to agricultural land on which property tax was paid on the basis of an assessment other than farm or agricultural use in certain years before the transfer; exempting an instrument of writing from the agricultural land transfer tax if the instrument of writing transfers title to agricultural land that was previously transferred by a certain instrument of writing; etc.
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566 |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-3) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {315066/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-10-02 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
Assessments
Exemptions
Farmland
Land Records
Property Tax
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Time
Titles
Transfer Tax
Assessments
Exemptions
Farmland
Land Records
Property Tax
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Time
Titles
Transfer Tax