MD HB199 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating in Queen Anne's County a beer, wine and liquor tasting license; specifying to whom the license may be issued; setting maximum limits on the amounts of individual servings; specifying that the license may be issued for tasting purposes only; and establishing a $100 license fee.
Title
Queen Anne's County - Beer, Wine and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Queen Anne's County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Queen Anne's County