MD HB195 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting carriers from offering health benefits under the Maryland State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program unless the carrier also offers certain qualified health benefit plans through the Individual Exchange of the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange; exempting a carrier from the requirement to offer certain qualified health benefit plans through the Individual Exchange under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Benefits - Required Participation in the Individual Exchange by Carriers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-02-12HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-04HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-16HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance31110(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions2501(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions2518(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback