MD HB190 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB427
Note: Carry Over of previous HB212
Note: Carry Over of previous HB212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain provisions relating to immunity from criminal arrest, charge, or prosecution for a person experiencing a medical emergency after ingesting or using alcohol or drugs or assisting someone experiencing a certain medical emergency.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 3:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2021-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB190 (Carry Over) 2022-01-13 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
HB212 (Carry Over) 2021-01-15 - Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
HB212 (Carry Over) 2021-01-15 - Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Subjects
Arrests
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Good Samaritan
Health
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Good Samaritan
Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 1 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0190?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0190f.pdf |