MD HB189 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring residential service agencies to submit certain reports to the Maryland Department of Labor regarding wage rates for personal care aides on or before September 1 each year, beginning in 2025; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by the 180th day after the release of the final federal Ensuring Access to Medicaid Services rule on an overview of the final rule and plans or steps that the Department will take to operationalize the rule.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Personal Care Aides - Wage Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-32) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-11) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {963424/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-30) |
2024-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {663528/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2023-10-27 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Medical Assistance
Prices
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Medical Assistance
Prices
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 155 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |