MD HB186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Court Dog and Child Witness Program to be the Court Dog Program; expanding the application of the Program to veterans participating in a court-supervised, comprehensive, and voluntary treatment-based program; establishing that the Program shall be in the circuit court of each county that participates in the Program and in the District Court of each county that participates in the Program under certain circumstances; altering the purpose of the Program; etc.
Title
Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {472519/1 Adopted |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-06-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB7 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Dogs
meetings
Veterans
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Dogs
meetings
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 9 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |