MD HB186 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain authority of the Prince George's County Executive to appoint a vice chair of the Prince George's County Board of Education; requiring the elected members of the county board to elect a vice chair of the county board from among the elected members of the county board; and altering the percentage of the voting members of the county board from two-thirds to three-fifths that is required to take action that is contrary to an action of the Chief Executive Officer of the Prince George's County public school system.
Title
Prince George’s County Board of Education – Election of Vice Chair and Voting Procedures PG 507–18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {623625/1 (Delegate Walker) Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Walker) Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {815766/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
County Executives
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Voting
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Voting