MD HB184 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that a firearm application contain a copy of the applicant's handgun qualification license; and requiring that a firearm application contain the applicant's handgun qualification license number, with a specified exception.
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {838472/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-21 | House | First Reading Judiciary |