MD HB183 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Hearing 2/11 at 4:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each official custodian to adopt a policy of proactive disclosure of public records; requiring each official custodian to publish by July 1 each year a report on a certain website on the requests received in the preceding year for inspection of public records; requiring each official custodian to store the report in a place easily accessible to the public if a website is not available; requiring the Public Information Act Compliance Board to receive, review, and resolve certain complaints from applicants; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseHearing 2/11 at 4:00 p.m.
2021-02-09HouseHearing canceled
2020-12-23HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-09-08HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB449 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-23 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback