MD SB449 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each official custodian to adopt a policy of proactive disclosure of public records available for inspection; authorizing the official custodian to adopt a policy appropriate to the type of public record, to reflect the staff and resources of the governmental unit, and to include publication of public records on certain websites; altering the composition of the State Public Information Act Compliance Board; requiring the Board to receive, review, and resolve certain complaints from applicants; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2021-03-30HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {824435/1 Adopted
2021-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-23SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
2021-02-23SenateHearing canceled
2021-02-10SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB183 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions4101(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4104(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4105(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions41A-02(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions41A-03(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions41A-10(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions41B-01(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions41B-02(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions41B-04(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4203(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4362(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4-1A04(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4-1A5(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4-1A6(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4-1A7(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4-1A8(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback