MD HB1764 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a paramedic, subject to certain rules, regulations, protocols, orders, and standards, to dispense naloxone in a nonemergency environment in accordance with the Overdose Response Program; providing that a paramedic who dispenses naloxone in accordance with the Program is not subject to any disciplinary action by the EMS Board; authorizing a paramedic to dispense naloxone to certain individuals; providing that a certain cause of action may not arise against a paramedic under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Health - Overdose Response Program - Dispensing of Naloxone by Paramedics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Discipline
Drugs
Emergency Medical Services
Health
Health Occupations
Liability
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Discipline
Drugs
Emergency Medical Services
Health
Health Occupations
Liability
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse