MD HB176 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB680
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow certain individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; allowing certain individuals to claim a refund of the credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Calculation and Refundability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB680 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
SB897 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
SB897 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0176?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0176f.pdf |