MD HB176 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the appointing authority of a State correctional facility to impose on a correctional officer an emergency suspension of correctional powers without pay if the correctional officer is charged with a specified contraband violation; providing that the correctional officer who receives an emergency suspension without pay after being charged with a misdemeanor and who is not convicted of the misdemeanor violation shall have the emergency suspension rescinded and any lost benefits restored, subject to a specified exception.
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Facilities - Officers and Inspection Standards
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143 |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {254865/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Weapons
Work, Labor and Employment
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Weapons
Work, Labor and Employment