MD HB173 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the prohibition against an employer requiring, as a condition of employment, that an individual submit to or take a polygraph examination or other similar test an individual who applies for employment or is employed as a correctional officer of a State correctional facility and an individual who applies for employment with or is employed by a State correctional facility in any capacity that involves direct contact with an inmate in a State correctional facility; requiring a report; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {302210/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Lie Detection
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Correctional Officers
Lie Detection
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment