MD HB1702 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making it mandatory for a certain local superintendent of schools or school principal to transmit certain information concerning the arrest of a student for a certain reportable offense or offense related to the student's membership in a criminal gang and the disposition of a certain offense as a confidential file to the local superintendent of another school in the State in which the student has enrolled or to which the student has been transferred for certain purposes under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Education
Electronic Communication
Gangs
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
School Administration
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Education
Electronic Communication
Gangs
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
School Administration
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology