MD HB168 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a member of a specified board, commission, or council under the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation shall be considered to have resigned if the member does not attend at least two-thirds of the meetings during any consecutive 12-month period while the member was serving, subject to a specified exception; requiring specified notice to be provided to the Governor; requiring the Governor to appoint a successor under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Boards, Commissions, and Councils - Member Removal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {864934/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Governor
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Safety
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Governor
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Safety
State Government - Regulations and Procedures