MD HB1662 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-6)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting retail pet stores from offering for sale, transferring, or disposing of cats or dogs; repealing certain provisions of law that authorize the sale of certain cats and dogs and set forth the requirements for a retail pet store that offers to sell certain cats or dogs under certain circumstances; stating the intent of the General Assembly that animal welfare organizations initiate contact with retail pet stores to facilitate the showcasing of dogs and cats for adoption or for purchase from local breeders; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-8) (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-11) (Y: 124 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (129-8)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {447276/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (123-11)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFloor Amendment {973520/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected
2018-03-15HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Rey) Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {213390/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-12HouseHearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1662&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1662f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1662t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1662e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_237_hb1662e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1662_21339001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1662_97352001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1662_44727601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb1662.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1662_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0512.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1662_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1335.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1225.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback