MD HB1661 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Center for School Safety to make grants for specified security-related projects to schools and child care centers determined to be at risk of specified crimes or attacks; authorizing specified schools or child care centers to apply to the Center for a specified State grant; establishing the terms and conditions for the use of specified State grant funds by specified recipients; etc.
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {565668/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-13 | House | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (135-0) |
2017-03-13 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Board of
Grants
Harassment
Human Relations
Private Schools
Public Safety
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Violence
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Board of
Grants
Harassment
Human Relations
Private Schools
Public Safety
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Violence