MD HB1643 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a certain taxpayer to claim a certain credit against the State income tax for certain contributions during the taxable year to the Maryland Excellence in Education Fund; requiring a certain reduction of itemized deductions if the credit is claimed under certain circumstances; providing that any unused credit may be carried forward to succeeding taxable years, subject to certain limitations; establishing the Maryland Excellence in Education Fund; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Contributions to the Maryland Excellence in Education Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Education
Education, State Department of
Gifts
Higher Education Commission
Income Tax
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Treasurers
Comptroller
Construction
Education
Education, State Department of
Gifts
Higher Education Commission
Income Tax
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Treasurers