MD HB164 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the amount of a supersedeas bond required to stay the enforcement of a judgment in a civil action; authorizing a court to reduce further the amount of a supersedeas bond; providing a procedure by which an appellee may seek discovery for the limited purpose of determining whether an appellant has dissipated or diverted assets under specified circumstances; requiring a circuit court to retain jurisdiction over a specified action for a specified limited purpose; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Judgments - Appeals - Supersedeas Bond
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-19) (Y: 118 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-10) (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (DeGrange) Rejected (20-21) (Y: 20 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-10) (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (DeGrange) Rejected (20-21) (Y: 20 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-19) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-10) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Motion Special Order until later today (Senator DeGrange) Rejected (20-21) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {138579/2 Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {882116/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appeals
Bonds
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Judgments
Jurisdiction
Penalties and Sentences
Small Business
Bonds
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Judgments
Jurisdiction
Penalties and Sentences
Small Business