MD HB1633 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $350,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Mayor and Town Council of the Town of Capitol Heights for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping related to the Capitol Heights Municipal Multiservice Center, located in Prince George's County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Capitol Heights Municipal Multiservice Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |