MD HB1598 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 797
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 797
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the educational requirements to qualify for a license to practice massage therapy; altering the educational requirements to qualify to be registered to practice massage therapy; and requiring each holder of a license or registration to practice massage therapy to display the license or registration conspicuously where the holder is engaged in practice.
Title
Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-3) (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-3) (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 797 |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2018-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {854537/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-3) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {876889/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Continuing Education
Education
Exemptions
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Massage
Medical Research
Notices
Physical Therapists
Registration
Signs and Billboards
Students
Time
Education
Exemptions
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Massage
Medical Research
Notices
Physical Therapists
Registration
Signs and Billboards
Students
Time