MD HB1597 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 796
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 796
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain Executive Branch Departments to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by October 1, 2018, regarding how many applications for occupational licenses and certificates were received during the preceding 5 years, how many of these applicants had a certain criminal record, how much time had passed since the criminal conviction, how many applications were denied based on the applicant's crime record, and under which provision of law the license was denied.
Title
Occupational Licenses or Certificates – Application Determinations – Use of Criminal History – Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-46) (Y: 89 N: 47 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-31) (Y: 106 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-31) (Y: 106 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 796 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-46) |
2018-04-09 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {574238/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-31) |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {892018/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Environment, Department of
Ex-Offenders
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Environment, Department of
Ex-Offenders
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Time
Work, Labor and Employment