MD HB159 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senators Smith, Brochin, and Norman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senators Smith, Brochin, and Norman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified exception relating to law enforcement officers to the prohibition on carrying specified weapons on public school property; prohibiting the carrying or possession of specified firearms on the property of public institutions of higher education; requiring a public institution of higher education to post specified signs in prominent locations on the property; requiring the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to incorporate into their bylaws, policies and procedures, the current weapons practice on campus; etc.
Title
Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (27-20) (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-49) (Y: 84 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {763320/1 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (53-82) (Y: 53 N: 82 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {623021/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (52-84) (Y: 52 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {943728/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Rejected (52-84) (Y: 52 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-49) (Y: 84 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {763320/1 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (53-82) (Y: 53 N: 82 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {623021/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (52-84) (Y: 52 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {943728/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Rejected (52-84) (Y: 52 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senators Smith, Brochin, and Norman |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2017-04-07 | House | Delegates B. Barnes, Valentino-Smith, and Ciliberti |
2017-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-04-07 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2017-04-07 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (27-20) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {228373/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (84-49) |
2017-02-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-08 | House | Floor Amendment {763320/1 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (53-82) |
2017-02-08 | House | Floor Amendment {623021/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (52-84) |
2017-02-08 | House | Floor Amendment {943728/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Rejected (52-84) |
2017-02-07 | House | Special Order until 2/8 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted |
2017-02-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {384766/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Higher Education
Public Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Universities and Colleges
Guns
Higher Education
Public Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Universities and Colleges