MD HB1583 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Comptroller, beginning January 1, 2018, to provide specified written and electronic notice of the availability of credits against the State and federal income taxes for earned income; requiring that specified written notice be included in specified income tax return materials in a specified manner; requiring that specified electronic notice be posted on the Internet tax filing system of the Comptroller in a specified manner; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Notice of Availability
Sponsors
Del. Bilal Ali [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-08 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2017-02-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |