MD HB1579 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Law Enforcement Coordinating Council to prevent and reduce crime by coordinating and focusing State resources and ensuring interagency communication and intelligence-sharing; requiring the Council to prepare a certain comprehensive crime plan for the State; requiring the Council to meet quarterly; requiring the Governor to attend at least one Council meeting each year; and requiring the Council to submit a report with its recommendations by December 1 each year to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Crime Plan and Law Enforcement Councils (Maryland State Crime Plan)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB907 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Emergency Bills
Governor
Housing
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Parole and Probation
Prerelease and Reentry
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Transportation
Victims
Warrants
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Emergency Bills
Governor
Housing
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Parole and Probation
Prerelease and Reentry
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Transportation
Victims
Warrants
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 2 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 2 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1579?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1579f.pdf |