MD HB1577 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $500,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Mayor and City Council of the City of Havre de Grace for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the American Indian First Contact Waterfront Heritage Park, located in Harford County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - American Indian First Contact Waterfront Heritage Park
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2016-02-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |