MD HB1570 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the legislative body of a municipal corporation in Prince George's County to authorize the erection of a fence that exceeds specified height restrictions or limitations, under specified circumstances; correcting a specified reference to the Maryland-Washington regional district; repealing specified provisions of law authorizing a municipal corporation in Prince George's County to enact specified local laws regulating fences; etc.
Title
Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority MC/PG 111-17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {110018/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Boundaries
Counties - Local Laws
County Councils
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Prince George's County
Zoning and Planning
Boundaries
Counties - Local Laws
County Councils
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Prince George's County
Zoning and Planning