MD HB1568 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Public Works to issue a license to dredge and fill on State wetlands for a development project to expand a marina that historically operated as a working marina for the sole purpose of supporting aquaculture or seafood operations or to improve navigational access; etc.
Title
Board of Public Works - Licenses to Dredge and Fill on State Wetlands - Working
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-10 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-04-09 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (137-3) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-05 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-02 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-24 | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-03-24 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Conway) Adopted (135-0) | |
2010-03-24 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Dredging
Licenses
Marinas
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Oysters
Public Works, Board of
Wetlands
Zoning and Planning
Dredging
Licenses
Marinas
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Oysters
Public Works, Board of
Wetlands
Zoning and Planning