MD HB1560 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission from discriminating against a person on the basis of genetic information or family responsibilities; and requiring that a certain nondiscrimination provision in contracts entered into by the Commission prohibit certain discrimination based on genetic information.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited PG/MC 103-20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {696385/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Discrimination
Genetics
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor and Employment
Discrimination
Genetics
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 27 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 16 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 17 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 17 | 402.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |