MD HB1560 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-04 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-04 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the sale of unpackaged underwear or an unsealed package of multiple pairs of underwear at a retail establishment be a final sale except under specified circumstances; allowing a retail establishment to accept specified underwear for return and a refund or exchange; prohibiting a retail establishment from selling underwear that has been previously sold and returned to the retail establishment; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Sales of Previously Sold Underwear - Prohibited
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. Aisha Braveboy [D] | Del. Hattie Harrison [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] |
Del. Veronica Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-04 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (137-2) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-22 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2010-03-19 | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-03-19 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted (134-0) | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |