MD HB155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB850
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a county board, public prekindergarten program, primary or secondary school, or nonpublic prekindergarten program or primary or secondary school that receives State funds from discriminating against a person, refusing enrollment of a prospective student, expelling a current student, or withholding privileges from certain individuals, or taking certain retaliatory actions on the basis of race, ethnicity, color, religion, sex, age, national origin, marital status, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability; etc.
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-45) |
2021-02-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {265460/1 Adopted |
2021-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-10-12 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB155 (Carry Over) 2021-02-26 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB98 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
SB98 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Age
Appeals
Appropriations
Budgets
Comptroller
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Hearings
Human Relations
Marriage
Mediation
Minorities
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Religion
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Students
Appeals
Appropriations
Budgets
Comptroller
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Hearings
Human Relations
Marriage
Mediation
Minorities
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Religion
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |