MD HB1547 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a producer of synthetic turf and turf infill, on or before January 1, 2021, to individually or as part of a stewardship organization submit a synthetic turf and turf infill stewardship plan to the Department of the Environment for review and approval; etc.
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Producer Responsibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Copyright
Electronic Communication
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Notices
Plastics
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Time
Contracts
Copyright
Electronic Communication
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Notices
Plastics
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 2301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |