MD HB1543 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Climate Crisis Initiative in the Department of the Environment for certain purposes; requiring the Secretary of the Environment to administer certain schedules of greenhouse gas pollution fees; requiring the Secretary to delegate certain collection and benefit functions to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to carry out certain functions; requiring the collection of a certain greenhouse gas pollution fee on certain fuels for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB912 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-18 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age of Majority
Agriculture
Ambulances
Animals
Appropriations
Budgets
Buses
Coal
Commerce and Business
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fuel
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Interest
Investments
Mass Transit
Minors
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Natural Resources
Poverty
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Railroads
Refuse Disposal
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Residency
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Transportation
Trucks
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weather
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor and Employment
Age of Majority
Agriculture
Ambulances
Animals
Appropriations
Budgets
Buses
Coal
Commerce and Business
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fuel
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Interest
Investments
Mass Transit
Minors
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Natural Resources
Poverty
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Railroads
Refuse Disposal
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Residency
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Transportation
Trucks
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weather
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 2 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1222 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1224 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1227 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1543?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1543f.pdf |