MD HB1536 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which certain individuals are exempt from paying the out-of-state tuition rate at public institutions of higher education; altering the circumstances under which certain individuals are eligible to pay the resident tuition rate at a public senior higher education institution or the in-county rate at a community college; requiring certain individuals to retain a certain tuition status until the individual is awarded a certain degree under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions

Sponsors

Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]
Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]
Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]
Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]
Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]
Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]
Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]
Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]
Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]
Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Karen Young [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-47) (Y: 89 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (88-47)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {535867/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-12HouseReassigned to Ways and Means
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback