MD HB1531 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a member of the Prince George's County Republican Party Central Committee to run at large to fill historically vacant seats; altering the composition of the committee; and making a conforming change.
Title
Election Law - Prince George's County Republican Party Central Committee - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (ODonnell) Adopted (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (ODonnell) Adopted (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-12 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-03-11 | House | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (131-0) |
2013-03-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |