MD HB1526 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the eligibility requirements for an individual to be certified by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission as a police officer to require an individual to be either a United States citizen or a permanent legal resident of the United States who is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces and who pledges to apply for or obtain United States citizenship within 6 years of the employment start date with the law enforcement agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-53) (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (84-53)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {752115/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-02-27HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback