MD HB1524 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, beginning on January 1, 2021, certain invitations to bid and certain requests for proposals to require bidders and offerors to provide certain documentation; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and county departments of corrections to give a preference to certain bidders and offerors based on the number of formerly incarcerated individuals the bidder or offeror employs; etc.
Title
Procurement and Correctional Facilities - Employment Opportunities for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB858 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Cybersecurity
Demographics
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Ethnic Affairs
Evidence
Ex-Offenders
Gender
internet
Labor, Department of
Notices
Parole and Probation
Privacy
Procurement
Public Information
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Age
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Cybersecurity
Demographics
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Ethnic Affairs
Evidence
Ex-Offenders
Gender
internet
Labor, Department of
Notices
Parole and Probation
Privacy
Procurement
Public Information
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 8-7A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 8-7A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 8-7A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1524?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1524f.pdf |