MD HB1517 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration by December 1 each year to submit a report on behavioral health services for children and young adults in the State to the Governor and the General Assembly; requiring the Social Services Administration by December 1 each year to submit a report on voluntary placement agreements for children and young adults in the State to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {697071/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {466787/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1517&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1517f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1517t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1517e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1517_46678701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1517_69707101.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0004.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb1517.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1517_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0571.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1517_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1040.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1108.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback