MD HB1514 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Elections, beginning with the 2028 statewide primary election, to use ranked-choice voting to conduct a contest for the nomination by a political party of a candidate for the office of President of the United States; and requiring the State Board of Elections to develop and pay the cost of a certain voter education campaign under certain circumstances.
Title
Elections - Ranked-Choice Voting - Contests for Presidential Nomination
Sponsors
Del. Kris Fair [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-03-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-11 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2024-02-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Awareness and Outreach
Education
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Federal Government
internet
Political Candidates
Reports
Voting
Education
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Federal Government
internet
Political Candidates
Reports
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 8 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |