MD HB1504 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting recent high school graduates from payment of tuition to attend a community college in the State under specified circumstances; providing a 50% discount on tuition to unemployed individuals attending a community college in the State under specified circumstances; requiring the State to reimburse community colleges for foregone tuition revenue; requiring that funds used to reimburse community colleges shall be paid from the Education Trust Fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2014
Sponsors
Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2014-03-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Community Colleges
Education
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
Students
Tuition
Community Colleges
Education
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
Students
Tuition