MD HB15 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that full-time deputy sheriffs at the rank of captain and below and full-time correctional officers at the rank of captain and below in the Office of the Sheriff of Harford County have the right to organize and negotiate with the Harford County Executive and Harford County Sheriff with regard to certain wages and employee health care premium share; requiring the right to organize and negotiate to be conducted in accordance with certain provisions of the Harford County Code unless otherwise provided in the Act; etc.
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Organization and Negotiation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-08-04 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Correctional Officers
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Harford County
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Contracts
Correctional Officers
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Harford County
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs