MD HB1498 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a certain social organization in Harford County to seek certain alcoholic beverages licenses under certain circumstances; requiring a social organization seeking a license to meet certain criteria; and authorizing a social organization to sell alcoholic beverages on Monday through Sunday, from 4 p.m. to 11 p.m.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Social Organization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-23SenateHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {323996/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback