MD HB1495 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to develop and adopt certain educational facilities sufficiency standards, to create the Maryland School Facility Condition Index, and to conduct a statewide facility assessment on or before January 1, 2020, and annually thereafter; requiring the Interagency Committee to establish rankings based on certain criteria; requiring certain conditions for the statewide facility assessment; requiring the Interagency Committee to compare certain data; etc.
Title
Public School Construction Assessment and Maintenance Reform Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Data
Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Records
Time
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Data
Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Records
Time