MD HB1488 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-14)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Office for the Certified Local Farm Enterprise Program in the Department of Agriculture; establishing the Certified Local Farm Enterprise Program in the Office to encourage certain units to try to achieve an overall percentage goal of 20% of the unit's total dollar value of procurement contracts for food from certain certified local farm enterprises; establishing a Certified Local Farm Enterprise Food Aggregation Grant Fund; etc.
Title
Certified Local Farm Enterprise Program and Certified Local Farm Enterprise Food Aggregation Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {706589/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB985 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Exemptions
Fees
Food
Forms
Fraud
Grants
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Procurement
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Storage
Subpoenas
Time
Weights and Measures
Witnesses
Agriculture, Department of
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Exemptions
Fees
Food
Forms
Fraud
Grants
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Procurement
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Storage
Subpoenas
Time
Weights and Measures
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |